EP0792092 - Process for manufacturing a composite arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/50] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagenbrenner, Walter Welzheimer Weg 12 71732 Tamm / DE | 02 /
Wiesa, Thomas Im Hoernle 26 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 03 /
Schimitzek, Ralph Schillerstr. 24 74248 Ellhofen / DE | [1997/35] | Application number, filing date | 96117583.3 | 02.11.1996 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | DE1996107014 | 24.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19607014 | [1997/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792092 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0792092 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0792092 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H05K7/20 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
H05K3/0061 (EP,US);
H05K3/3447 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0367 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10901 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1178 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1394 (EP,US);
H05K3/0094 (EP,US);
Y10T156/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verbundanordnung | [1997/35] | English: | Process for manufacturing a composite arrangement | [1997/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un agencement composite | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2153595 (O KEY PRINTED WIRING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH0456187 ; | [A]DE4307134 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, line 6 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH04296084 ; | [A]JPH04206675 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920610), vol. 16, no. 255, Database accession no. (E - 1214), & JP04056187 A 19920224 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930310), vol. 17, no. 115, Database accession no. (E - 1330), & JP04296084 A 19921020 (YAMASHITA SAAKITETSUKU KK) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921110), vol. 16, no. 539, Database accession no. (E - 1289), & JP04206675 A 19920728 (NIPPON AVIONICS CO) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4240996 |