EP0773443 - Micro-machined accelerometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2000/15] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flach, Georg Döffingerstr. 29 71120 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
Nothelfer, Udo Försterweg 3 89278 Nersingen / DE | 03 /
Schuster, Günther, Dr. Eschenbacher Str. 26 73108 Gammelshausen / DE | 04 /
Weber, Heribert Weileräcker 8 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117587.4 | 02.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | DE1995141388 | 07.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19541388 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773443 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773443 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/125, G01P15/08 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P2015/0831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Mikromechanischer Beschleunigungssensor | [1997/20] | English: | Micro-machined accelerometer | [1997/20] | French: | Accéléromètre micro-usine | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4126100 (UNIV CHEMNITZ TECH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, lines 50-53; figures 1,2A,4 *; | [A]US4918032 (JAIN KAILASH C [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, lines 29-41 * * column 7, lines 17-28; figures 1,7,13 *; | [A]GB2101336 (CENTRE ELECTRON HORLOGER [CH]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, lines 48-78; figures 1-3 *; | [D]US4483194 (RUDOLF FELIX [CH]) | by applicant | US4483194 |