EP0766103 - A diffractive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION 407 Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Robert Arthur 13, Wilkinson Street East Burwood, Victoria 3151 / AU | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/14] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117655.9 | 04.08.1994 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | AU1993PM00387 | 06.08.1993 Original published format: AU PM038793 | AU1993PM01112 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: AU PM111293 | AU1994PM04867 | 07.04.1994 Original published format: AU PM486794 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766103 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766103 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, G02B27/44, B44F1/12, B42D15/10, B42D209/00 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G02B5/1842 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/14] | Extension states | LT | 20.11.1996 | SI | 20.11.1996 | Title | German: | Diffraktive Vorrichtung | [1997/14] | English: | A diffractive device | [1997/14] | French: | Dispositif diffractif | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94922190.7 / EP0712500 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2002
01.06.2004
WITHDRAWN GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2002
01.06.2004
WITHDRAWN GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2002
05.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2002
05.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE | 10.04.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.10.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 24.08.2004 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2001 | BE | 23.05.2001 | CH | 23.05.2001 | IT | 23.05.2001 | LI | 23.05.2001 | NL | 23.05.2001 | LU | 04.08.2001 | IE | 06.08.2001 | DK | 23.08.2001 | PT | 23.08.2001 | SE | 23.08.2001 | GR | 24.08.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | MC | 01.03.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/44] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
LU | 04.08.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
GR | 24.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
MC | 01.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
LU | 04.08.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
GR | 24.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
GR | 24.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
DK | 23.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
NL | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
IE | 06.08.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
PT | 23.08.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 23.05.2001 | ||
LI | 23.05.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 23.05.2001 | |
BE | 23.05.2001 | ||
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 23.05.2001 | |
SE | 23.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 23.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0105099 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim 1 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0375833 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0497292 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 29 - line 56 * * figures 4-7 * | Examination | AU5372990B | AU1957683B | EP0240262 | WO9103747 | by applicant | WO1994AU00395 |