Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0773055
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.04.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
15.04.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
13.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
12.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
23.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.12.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
18.04.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
18.04.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
27.03.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] |