EP0774883 - Organic electroluminescence device with mixed hole transporting materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1997/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shi, Song Q. 4521 E. Gold Poppy Way Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US | 02 /
Gorsuch, Cynthia A. 3613 W. Angela Drive Glendale, Arizona 85308 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96118022.1 | 11.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | US19950560453 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: US 560453 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0774883 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0774883 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774883 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, H05B33/12 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
H05B33/12 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (KR);
H10K50/14 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/21] | Title | German: | Organische elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung mit gemischten Ladungslöchertransportmaterialien | [1997/21] | English: | Organic electroluminescence device with mixed hole transporting materials | [1997/21] | French: | Dispositif organique électroluminescent contenant un mélange de matériaux transportant des trous de charge | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04161480 ; | [A]WO9014744 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 21, line 20 - page 27, line 25 * * page 35, line 10 - line 14 *; | [DA]US5061569 (VANSLYKE STEVEN A [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * column 7, line 17 - line 32 *; | [A]EP0510541 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-3 * example 4 *; | [A]EP0517542 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 54 * * page 13, line 46 - line 58 *; | [DA]US5256945 (IMAI KUNIO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-4 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 40 - line 65 *; | [A]EP0611148 (SHIROTA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 35 - page 5, line 28 * * figure 1 * * page 9, line 35 - line 37 *; | [A]EP0650955 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 45 - page 11, line 50 * * page 65, line 23 - line 27 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 29, Database accession no. 92-238615, XP002032098 & JPH04161480 A 19920604 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [DA] - ADACHI C ET AL, "MOLECULAR DESIGN OF HOLE TRANSPORT MATERIALS FOR OBTAINING HIGH DURABILITY IN ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DIODES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19950515), vol. 66, no. 20, pages 2679 - 2681, XP000507576 [DA] 1 * figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.113123 | by applicant | US4720432 | US5061569 | US5256945 | - SHIROTA., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1993), vol. 97, page 6240 | - ADACHI., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1995), vol. 66, no. 20, page 2679 | US19940304454 |