EP0773127 - Hybrid vehicle drive system with clutch for controlling engine driven planetary gear connected to motor/generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibaraki, Ryuji c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kubo, Seitoku c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Taga, Yutaka c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Hata, Hiroshi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Mikami, Tsuyoshi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Matsui, Hideaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118132.8 | 12.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | JP19950294148 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: JP 29414895 | JP19960249356 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24935696 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773127 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773127 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773127 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B60K6/36 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/383 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W30/18127 (US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60K2006/541 (EP,US);
B60K5/04 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2710/025 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/428 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0043 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0047 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2005 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2012 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2015 (EP,US);
F16H2200/203 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2051 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2056 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2058 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2061 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H3/725 (EP,US);
F16H57/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/0206 (EP,US);
F16H61/0211 (EP,US);
F16H61/21 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
Y10S903/905 (EP,US);
Y10S903/906 (EP,US);
Y10S903/909 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP,US);
Y10S903/912 (EP,US);
Y10S903/913 (EP,US);
Y10S903/914 (EP,US);
Y10S903/917 (EP,US);
Y10S903/919 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/20] | Title | German: | Antriebssystem für Hybridfahrzeug mit Kupplung zwischen Brennkraftmaschine zum Schalten eines dem Motor/Generator vorgeschalteten Planetengetriebes | [1997/20] | English: | Hybrid vehicle drive system with clutch for controlling engine driven planetary gear connected to motor/generator | [1997/20] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement hybride pour véhicule, avec embrayage pour contrôler un train planétaire lié au moteur générateur | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3623568 (MORI YOICHI) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0528412 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [Y] 27 * figures 6-9 *; | [XAY]EP0645271 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,10,13-20,23-26 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 14 * * column 6, line 46 - column 11, line 21; figure 1 * [A] 8,9,11,12,21,22,27 [Y] 27; | [PX]EP0716947 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [PX] 1,26 * figure -; claim - *; | [PX]US5562565 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,27 * claim - *; | [T]EP0769404 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [T] 1,27* figure - * | by applicant | US5258651 |