EP0775564 - Method and apparatus for producing blades for electrophotographic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/22] | Blade for electrophotographic devices and production method and production apparatus for same | ||
[2001/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANDO KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states BANDO KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Yoshinori 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 02 /
Noda, Takeshi 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 03 /
Shigechika, Yuichi 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 04 /
Taniguchi, Toshiharu 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | 05 /
Tani, Arata 2-15 Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe / JP | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1997/22] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Kühhornshofweg 10 60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118151.8 | 13.11.1996 | [1997/22] | Priority number, date | JP19950329749 | 24.11.1995 Original published format: JP 32974995 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0775564 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0775564 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775564 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/26, B29C67/24, G03G21/00, // B29K75:00 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
B29B7/7404 (EP);
B29B7/7414 (EP);
B29B7/7433 (EP);
B29C43/22 (EP);
B29C67/246 (EP);
G03G21/0017 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | B29C43/22, B29C67/24, G03G21/00, // B29K75:00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Rakeln für elektrophotographische Geräte | [2001/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing blades for electrophotographic devices | [2001/27] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication de racles pour appareils électrophotographiques | [2001/27] |
Former [1997/22] | Rakel für Elektrophotographische Geräte und Herstelleungsverfahren und -vorrichtung dafür | ||
Former [1997/22] | Blade for electrophotographic devices and production method and production apparatus for same | ||
Former [1997/22] | Racle pour appareil electrophotographique, méthode et dispositif pour sa production | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.05.2002 | IT | 08.05.2002 | GB | 13.11.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/22] | BE | 08.05.2002 | |
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 08.05.2002 | |
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 08.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0686471 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PX] 1-10 * figures 1-4; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0535875 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3-7 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 20 - line 57; claims 1,3,4,8,10 *; | [Y]DE4116562 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,3-7 * examples 3,4; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP0167775 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-7 * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]FR2311643 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]) [Y] 1,3-7 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB1089360 (DEGUSSA) [Y] 8 * page 2, line 33 - line 35; figures 2,3; claims 1,3,5 *; | [Y]DE4319062 (KRAFTANLAGEN AG HEIDELBERG [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2; claims 1-4,6 *; | [A]JPH04175330 ; | [A]EP0617066 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * page 4, line 11 - line 15; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9316851 (HYDROVOIMA OY [FI]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE806431 (THEODOR TRAUDT DIPL ING) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 38 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2143098 (MEEDER ERNEST PETER) [A] 1,8 * figure 1; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4897026 (YOKOYA HISAO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figures 9,10; claim 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 31, Database accession no. 92-256518, XP002075545 & JPH04175330 A 19920623 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0570570 | JPH06118857 | JPH06318022 |