EP0843021 - A method for processing microstructure property optimization of alpha-beta titanium alloys to obtain simultaneous improvements in mechanical properties and fracture resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard, P.O. Box 4250 Seal Beach California 90740-8250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard, P.O. Box 4250 Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Soudani, Sami M. 13232 Bigelow Street Cerritos, CA 90701 / US | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/21] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118214.4 | 13.11.1996 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843021 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843021 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/18 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
C22F1/183 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Optimierung der mikrostrukturellen Eigenschaften von Alpha Beta-Titanlegierungen bei gleichzeitiger Verbesserung der mechanischen Eigenschaften und der Zähigkeit | [1998/21] | English: | A method for processing microstructure property optimization of alpha-beta titanium alloys to obtain simultaneous improvements in mechanical properties and fracture resistance | [1998/21] | French: | Procédé pour optimiser des propriétés microstructurelles d'alliages de titane alpha-beta afin d'améliorer simultanement leurs propriétés méchaniques et leur tenacité | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2138255 (UGINE KUHLMANN); | [A]FR2162843 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP); | [A]FR2162856 (XEROS); | [A]US4309226 (CHEN CHARLIE C); | [A]GB2148940 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [A] 1 * claims 1,9 *; | [A]EP0287486 (CEZUS CO EUROP ZIRCONIUM [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2623523 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3804358 (VER SCHMIEDEWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0487803 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 50 - page 6, line 20 *; | [A] - SAAL S ET AL, "EFFECT OF COOLING RATE ON CREEP AND LOW CYCLE FATIGUE RESISTANCE IN TI-6242", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR METALLKUNDE, (19900801), vol. 81, no. 8, pages 535 - 539, XP000169006 [A] 1 | [A] - M.J.DONACHIE JR, titanium - a technical guide, METALS PARK, OHIO, US, ASM, (1988), XP002028275 [A] * page 47; table 4.2 * |