EP0777091 - Improvement in the explosion-proof switch for a refrigeration apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Zanussi S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | [1998/14] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paroni, Luigi Via Leicht 17 33033 Codroipo (Udine) / IT | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2009/27] |
Former [1997/23] | Giugni, Valter, et al PROPRIA Protezione Proprietà Industriale S.r.L. Via Mazzini 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 96118340.7 | 15.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | IT1995PN00045U | 29.11.1995 Original published format: IT PN950045 U | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0777091 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0777091 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, H01H13/06 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP);
H01H13/06 (EP);
F25B2400/12 (EP);
H01H2009/048 (EP);
H01H9/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | Explosionssicherer Schalter für Kühlgerät | [1997/23] | English: | Improvement in the explosion-proof switch for a refrigeration apparatus | [1997/23] | French: | Commutateur anti-déflagrant pour appareil de réfrigération | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0683368 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]DE2146561 (METZENAUER & JUNG GMBH) [Y] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 * [A] 3; | [A]US3790734 (RAAB A ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 25 - column 14, line 55; figures 1-30 *; | [A]US3982089 (HYLTIN TOM M) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8815814U (BARLIAN REINHOLD) [A] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR817068 (LECQ ALBERT) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 62; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3887777 (NISHINO SHIRO) [A] 5 * column 2, line 25 - line 38; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE4312736 (KAPFER KARL); | [A]FR2042069 (TELEMECCANICA ELETTRICA) | by applicant | IT1994PN00030 | IT1994PN00032 |