EP0780542 - Drive for roller shutters, especially for shading devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schanz, Hans Schulweg 5 72226 Simmersfeld / DE | [1997/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Reimold, Otto Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Reimold, Otto, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys.Dr. H. Vetter Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel Hölderlinweg 58 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118427.2 | 16.11.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | DE1995148263 | 22.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19548263 | [1997/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0780542 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0780542 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/72, E06B9/174 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
E06B9/174 (EP,US);
E06B2009/1743 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/26] | E06B9/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, LU, NL [1997/26] | Title | German: | Rolladenantrieb, insbesondere für Beschattungseinrichtungen | [1997/26] | English: | Drive for roller shutters, especially for shading devices | [1997/26] | French: | Mécanisme d'entraînement de volets roulants, notamment pour systèmes de protection solaire | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 01.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2664324 (PEYRICHOU FERMETURES HENRI [FR]) [Y] 1-5,11,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 14 * * page 2, line 20 - line 24 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 14 * * page 3, line 19 - line 29 * * page 4, line 19 - line 22 * * page 5, line 4 - line 13 * * figure 1 * [A] 9,10; | [YA]DE4105975 (WUNDLING HERBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-5,11,13 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 43 - line 49 * * column 3, line 9 - line 15 * * column 4, line 15 - line 45 * * figures 2,3,6 * [A] 6-8,12 | by applicant | DE4100609 |