Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09221461 | Global Dossier | 26.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0775690 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2001 | B1 | EP0775690 | 28.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19543792 | 28.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59607127D1 | 26.07.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2158984T | 16.09.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5726331 | 10.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19543792 | 24.11.1995 |