EP0774300 - Compacting and treating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Via di Vittorio 20/22 I-41054 Marano Sul Panaro Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Via di Vittorio 20/22 I-41054 Marano Sul Panaro, Modena / IT | ||
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Uffici Commerciali, Via Garibaldi, 2 41058 Vignola (Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salda, Luciano Via de Gasperi 180 41058 Vignola (MO) / IT | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118462.9 | 18.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | IT1995MO00157 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: IT MO950157 | [1997/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774300 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774300 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/14, B02C18/14, B02C18/18, B30B9/32 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
B30B9/325 (EP);
B02C18/142 (EP);
B02C18/186 (EP);
B02C19/0093 (EP);
B02C2018/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/35] |
Former [1997/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Quetschvorrichtung und Aufbereitungsvorrichtung | [1997/21] | English: | Compacting and treating device | [1997/21] | French: | Dispositif de compactage et de traitement | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI | 15.05.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.03.2002 | GR | 20.03.2002 | IE | 20.03.2002 | NL | 20.03.2002 | DK | 20.06.2002 | PT | 20.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | AT | 18.11.2002 | LU | 18.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/14] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
DK | 20.06.2002 | ||
PT | 20.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
AT | 18.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
DK | 20.06.2002 | ||
PT | 20.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
DK | 20.06.2002 | ||
PT | 20.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
DK | 20.06.2002 | ||
PT | 20.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
PT | 20.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
GR | 20.03.2002 | ||
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
IE | 20.03.2002 | ||
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 20.03.2002 | |
NL | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 20.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2749482 (SCHLEICHER CO FEINWERKTECH) [A] 36* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2039783 (CONAIR) [A] 28-34 * abstract *; | [A]EP0128652 (UNIROYAL INC [US]) [A] 27-29 * column A; figures 1-10 *; | [YDA]US4784251 (DEWOOLFSON BRUCE H [US], et al) [YD] 24,25 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 51; figures 5-9 * [A] 1,28,29; | [A]US5060875 (MCBRIDE THOMAS D [US]) [A] 35 * column A; figure 2 *; | [XAY]US5211109 (DETERMAN JEROME A [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,12,13,20,21,23 * column W * [A] 3-6,9,11,14-19,22,26-36 [Y] 24,25; | [A]WO9504597 (ACCO REXEL GROUP SERVICES PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,7,13,20-22,24,26 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4784251 | IT1993MO00140 |