blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0779169

EP0779169 - Operating device for supplementary heating in vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1997/25]For all designated states
MERCEDES-BENZ AG
Mercedesstrasse 136
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hilpert, Wolfgang
Bernsteinstrasse 96
70619 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Stotz, Manfred
Kernerweg 8
73773 Aichwald 2 / DE
[1997/25]
Application number, filing date96118488.419.11.1996
[1997/25]
Priority number, dateDE199514655513.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19546555
[1997/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0779169
Date:18.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0779169
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60H1/00
[1997/25]
CPC:
B60H1/00642 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/25]
TitleGerman:Bedieneinrichtung für eine Zusatzheizung in Kraftfahrzeugen[1997/25]
English:Operating device for supplementary heating in vehicles[1997/25]
French:Dispositif de commande pour un chauffage supplémentaire dans les véhicules[1997/25]
Examination procedure17.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/29]
27.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.03.2000
SE22.03.2000
GB19.11.2000
[2002/32]
Former [2002/29]SE22.03.2000
GB19.11.2000
Former [2002/12]GB19.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS55119540  ;
 [A]DE2518444  (WEILER WALTER);
 [A]US4274265  (OKUMURA SHUNJI) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 23; figure 1 *;
 [XY]DE3024983  (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 13, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 1; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,10-13;
 [Y]DE8806572U  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO) [Y] 2,10-13 * page 8, paragraph 3; figure . *;
 [AD]DE4315379  (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]);
 [A]US5350114  (NELSON KIRK A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 4 *;
 [PY]DE19515353  (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]) [PY] 3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801121), vol. 004, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 043), & JP55119540 A 19800913 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
by applicantDE4315379
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.