EP0786848 - Electronic monitoring of the driving force of a drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARANTEC ANTRIEBS- UND STEUERUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. PRODUKTIONS KG Remser Brook 11 D-33428 Marienfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states MARANTEC ANTRIEBS- UND STEUERUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. PRODUKTIONS KG Remser Brook 11 D-33428 Marienfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Michael Bokelerstrasse 22 33790 Halle/Westf. / DE | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118542.8 | 19.11.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | DE1996102633 | 25.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19602633 | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786848 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786848 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/085 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
H02H7/0851 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Elektronische Überwachung der Antriebskraft eines Antriebs | [1997/31] | English: | Electronic monitoring of the driving force of a drive | [1997/31] | French: | Surveillance électronique de la force motrice d'un entrainement | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0812188 ; | [XY]DE3501579 (EMAG MASCHFAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10,13 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 10; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,15; | [YA]DE4214998 (PRETTL ROLF [DE]) [Y] 3,5,15 * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 27; figure 4 *[A] 1 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08012188 A 19960116 (FUJIKURA LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |