EP0776697 - Copper-based catalysts, process for producing them and their use, and method for preparation of alkylhalogenosilanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 40699 Erkrath / DE | For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Hovestrasse 50 20539 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 40699 Erkrath / DE | ||
For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Hovestrasse 50 D-20539 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Hovestrasse 50 D-20539 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langner, Bernd, Dr. Glockenheide 11 21423 Winsen/Luhe / DE | 02 /
Stantke, Peter Holunderweg 21 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 03 /
Leister, Thomas Mittelschlag 6 23560 Lübeck / DE | 04 /
Steiner, Matthias-Sven, Dr. Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 2 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Degen, Bruno, Dr. Sommerhausen 60 53804 Much / DE | 06 /
Schartau, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Wasserturm 31 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
Licht, Elke, Dr. Am Sonnenhang 23 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/03] |
Former [1999/27] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr., et al Böhm Rauch Schumacher Krämer & Leifert Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1998/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1997/23] | Steiling, Lothar, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118554.3 | 20.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | DE19951044748 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19544748 | DE19961019161 | 11.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619161 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0776697 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0776697 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/72 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B01J37/0072 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
C07F7/16 (EP,US);
B01J23/76 (EP,US);
B01J37/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1997/23] | Title | German: | Katalysatoren auf Kupferbasis, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylhalogensilanen | [1997/23] | English: | Copper-based catalysts, process for producing them and their use, and method for preparation of alkylhalogenosilanes | [1997/23] | French: | Catalyseurs à base de cuivre, procédé pour leur fabrication ainsi que leur emploi et procédé pour la fabrication de alkylhalogénosilanes | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/23] | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP00105123.4 / EP1027927 | EP98101269.3 / EP0858833 | Request for further processing for: | 10.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US2380995 (ROCHOW EUGENE G) [DY] 15-17 * examples 3,4 *; | [DA]US4218387 (DEGEN BRUNO [DE], et al)[DA] 15-17; | [DX]US4504597 (KLAR ERHARD [US], et al) [DX] 1-5 * column 2, line 33 - line 62; example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [DXY]US4520130 (HASHIGUCHI DON H [US], et al) [DX] 1-6 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 14; claims 1,2 * * examples 1,2 * [Y] 15-17; | [A]GB2153697 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-5,15-17 | by applicant | US2380995 | US2420540 | US4218387 | US4487950 | US4504597 | US4520130 | DE3501085 | EP0182814 | US4762940 |