EP0763837 - Switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barlian, Reinhold Dieselstrasse 6 D-97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlian, Reinhold Dieselstrasse 6 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 02 /
Lux, Karl-Heinz Schwalbenweg 17 97990 Weikersheim / DE | 03 /
Mezger, Lothar Engelsberg 3 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 04 /
Fischle, Martin Schönbornstrasse 1 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | [1997/12] | Application number, filing date | 96118557.6 | 25.09.1993 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | DE19924233447 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233447 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763837 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763837 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/50, H02B1/04, H01H13/06, H01H9/04 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
H02B1/052 (EP);
H01H11/0006 (EP);
H01H13/063 (EP);
H01H13/285 (EP);
H02B1/04 (EP);
H02B1/26 (EP);
H02B1/041 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Schalteinrichtung | [1997/12] | English: | Switching device | [1997/12] | French: | Dispositif de commutation | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93115508.9 / EP0591796 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.1997 | 30.09.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.12.1999 | PT | 02.03.2000 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/43] | PT | 02.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3235678 (WOODCOCK CHARLES A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 50 *; | [A]DE2316872 (EBE ELEKTRO BAU ELEMENTE GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3543885 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH) [A] 2 * figure - *; | [A]FR2614132 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]DE8908758U (BÄR ELEKTROWERKE GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-3; claim 6 *; | [A]DE8908871U (BARLIAN REINHOLD) [A] 1* page 15-; figure - * | by applicant | DE8908871U |