EP0783994 - Vehicle alternator control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfab, Xaver Gartenstrasse 6 84424 Isen / DE | 02 /
Fröschl, Joachim Andechsstrasse 18 82211 Herrsching / DE | [1997/29] | Application number, filing date | 96118882.8 | 26.11.1996 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | DE1996100838 | 12.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19600838 | [1997/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783994 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783994 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H02J7/24, H02P9/30 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
H02J7/1446 (EP);
H02J7/2434 (EP);
H02P9/02 (EP);
B60R16/03 (EP);
H02J2310/46 (EP);
Y02T10/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/29] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für einen Generator eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1997/29] | English: | Vehicle alternator control system | [1997/29] | French: | Système de pilotage de l'alternateur d'un véhicule | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 16.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0720271 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [PX] 1,8 * column 6, line 53 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1427133 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 2 * page 1, line 78 - line 89; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0438884 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 20, line 18 - line 36; figures 27,28 *; | [A]US5349747 (DENNIS MICHAEL E [GB]) [A] 6 * column 4, line 49 - line 59; figures 8,9 *; | [A]EP0481862 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [A] 3,7 * column 5, line 2 - line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4445814 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4108751 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4108751 |