Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0777407 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | B1 | EP0777407 | 04.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950950 | 28.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69627274T | 05.02.2004 | T2 | DE69627274D1 | 15.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950950 | 28.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1280489 | 20.01.1998 | B1 | ITTO950950 | 28.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950950 | 28.11.1995 |