EP0777407 - Method of hermetically sealing a container of electromechanical components and sealed container thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Italia S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Italia Spa Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti 4 20145 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Portoso, Mauro Via Monviso, 11 10090 Sangano / IT | 02 /
Todesco, Floriano Via Di Vittorio, 17/B 10093 Collegno / IT | 03 /
Lando, Claudio Via Piranesi, 35 20137 Milano / IT | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96118923.0 | 26.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00950 | 28.11.1995 Original published format: IT TO950950 | [1997/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777407 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777407 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/06 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
H05K5/062 (EP);
H05K5/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abdichtung eines Gehäuses für elektromagnetische Bauteile und so abgedichtetes Gehäuse | [1997/23] | English: | Method of hermetically sealing a container of electromechanical components and sealed container thus obtained | [1997/23] | French: | Méthode pour rendre hermétiquement étanche un boîtier contenant des composants électromagnétiques et boîtier étanche obtenu par celle-ci | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 27.12.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | GB | 26.11.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/45] | ES | 30.10.2003 | |
GB | 26.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB975059 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2115084 (PLESSEY CO PLC) [A] 1* page 1, line 70 - line 93 *; | [A]DE4407967 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4,9 * the whole document * |