EP0786574 - Fastener for locking the wing of a window or a door to the frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIMENT, Société par actions simplifiée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIMENT 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, André 8, rue d'Italie 57444 Reding / FR | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119024.6 | 27.11.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | DE1996201180U | 24.01.1996 Original published format: DE 29601180 U | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786574 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786574 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E05C1/06, E05C7/04 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
E05C7/04 (EP);
E05C1/06 (EP);
E05B13/10 (EP);
E05C7/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsbeschlag zur Verriegelung eines Fenster- oder Türflügels am Blendrahmen | [1997/31] | English: | Fastener for locking the wing of a window or a door to the frame | [1997/31] | French: | Ferrure pour verrouiller un battant d'une fênetre ou d'une porte à un dormant | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2001
24.01.2002
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-AUBI KG. Postfach 10 05 51 57005 Siegen / DE | [2003/15] |
Former [2002/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2001
Siegenia-Frank KG Beschlag- und Lüftungstechnik Postfach 10 05 51 57005 Siegen / DE | 06.02.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.06.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 31.08.2009 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.03.2001 | DK | 21.06.2001 | SE | 21.06.2001 | GR | 22.06.2001 | AT | 27.11.2001 | LU | 27.11.2001 | BE | 30.11.2001 | CH | 30.11.2001 | LI | 30.11.2001 | GB | 27.11.2003 | ES | 28.11.2003 | IT | 27.11.2005 | FR | 30.11.2007 | DE | 03.06.2008 | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/48] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
GR | 22.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 28.11.2003 | ||
IT | 27.11.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2008 | ||
Former [2007/34] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
GR | 22.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 28.11.2003 | ||
IT | 27.11.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
GR | 22.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 28.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/51] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
GR | 22.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/31] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
AT | 27.11.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | NL | 21.03.2001 | |
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.11.2001 | ||
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | SE | 21.06.2001 | |
CH | 30.11.2001 | ||
LI | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 21.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT379850B (MAYER & CO RIEGEL BESCHLAG [AT]) [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8711496U (GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH BAUBESCHLAGFABRIK) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0445432 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0573819 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1,7* figure 2 * |