EP0777219 - Optical head apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohba, Akimoto NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119178.0 | 29.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950312383 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31238395 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777219 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B7/135 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
G11B7/12 (EP);
G11B7/1372 (EP);
G11B2007/0006 (EP);
G11B7/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/23] | Title | German: | Optische Kopfanordnung | [1997/23] | English: | Optical head apparatus | [1997/23] | French: | Dispositif de tête optique | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/45] | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH06333255 ; | [XY]JPH06333255 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]EP0558052 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0228227 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 45 - line 48; figure 1; claim 10 *; | [Y]JPH02187929 ; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 94, no. 012, & JP06333255 A 19941202 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3-9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901015), vol. 014, no. 472, Database accession no. (P - 1116), & JP02187929 A 19900724 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [PY] - ANONYMOUS, "Multi-Functional Optical Disk Drive", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (199607), vol. 39, no. 7, page 65, XP002025256 [PY] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - NIKKEI MECHANICALS., (199508), no. 460, pages 62 - 65 |