EP0777223 - Method of manufacturing a storage disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitano Engineering Co., Ltd. 98-1, Aza-tsukinowa Tanocho Komatsushima-shi Tokushima-ken 773 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states Kitano Engineering Co., Ltd. 98-1, Aza-tsukinowa Tanocho Komatsushima-shi, Tokushima-ken 773 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amo, Mikuni, c/o Kitano Engineering Co., Ltd. 98-1, Aza-tsukinowa Tanocho Komatsushima-shi, Tokushima-ken 773 / JP | 02 /
Inouchi, Masami, c/o Kitano Engineering Co., Ltd. 98-1, Aza-tsukinowa Tanocho Komatsushima-shi, Tokushima-ken 773 / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119204.4 | 29.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950338146 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: JP 33814695 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0777223 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0777223 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777223 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26, C09D4/00, C09J4/00, B29C35/02 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C65/1435 (EP,US);
B29C65/1483 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29C65/521 (EP,US);
B29C65/76 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/452 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29L2017/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/23] | G11B7/24, G11B7/26, C09D4/00, C09J4/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Speicherplatte | [1997/23] | English: | Method of manufacturing a storage disc | [1997/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un disque de stockage | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.08.2001 | NL | 22.08.2001 | [2008/22] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 22.08.2001 | |
NL | 22.08.2001 | ||
DE | 23.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/21] | NL | 22.08.2001 | |
FR | 18.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 22.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS6442037 ; | [Y]JPS61139956 ; | [Y]US3993815 (DOUEK MAURICE, et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]US4965117 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER FRIEDRICH K W [CA], et al) [Y] 2 * column 5, line 54 - line 57 *; | [Y]US4995799 (HAYASHI RYUTARO [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7,9,10 * column 13, line 32 - line 39; figures 13I,13J *; | [Y]US5401610 (MIWA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 2 *; | [PY]EP0744739 (KITANO ENG CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 6,7* abstract * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890606), vol. 013, no. 239, Database accession no. (P - 879), & JP01042037 A 19890214 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * sentences 1-5 * [A] 8 [Y] 2,5-7,9,10 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861115), vol. 010, no. 338, Database accession no. (P - 516), & JP61139956 A 19860627 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * |