EP0778039 - Catheter guide wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Vascular Systems, Inc. 360 Wakara Way Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Precision Vascular Systems, Inc. 360 Wakara Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | ||
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states SARCOS, INC. 360 Wakara Way Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobsen, Stephen C. 274 South 1200 East Salt Lake City, Utah 84192 / US | 02 /
Davis, Clark 4564 Wallace Lane Salt Lake City, Utah 84117 / US | 03 /
Wells, David 3581 East Millstream Lane Salt Lake City, Utah 84109 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119452.9 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | US19950568490 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: US 568490 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778039 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A61M25/0054 (EP);
A61M25/09 (EP);
A61M2025/09175 (EP);
A61M25/0138 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | Katheterführungsdraht | [1997/24] | English: | Catheter guide wire | [1997/24] | French: | Fil de guidage pour cathéter | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/07] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]US5437288 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-10,14-17,25-30 * The Whole Document * [A] 11-13 [Y] 2,19-24; | [Y]EP0608853 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 16, line 46 - page 17, line 13; figures 9,12,21,26 *; | [Y]US5345945 (HODGSON WILLIAM S [US], et al) [Y] 19-24 * column A; figures 1A-C; claims 8,10 *; | [AD]US5106455 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [A]US4998923 (SAMSON WILFRED J [US], et al); | [A]US5095915 (ENGELSON ERIK T [US]) | by applicant | US5437288 | US5411483 | US5106455 |