blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0781770

EP0781770 - 1,3-Dioxanes and liquid crystalline medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/27]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Poetsch, Eike, Dr.
Am Buchwald 4
64367 Mühltal / DE
02 / Lannert, Harald
Bahnhofstrasse 25
64407 Fränkisch Crumbach / DE
03 / Krause, Joachim, Dr.
Samuel-Morse-Strasse 14
64807 Dieburg / DE
04 / Tarumi, Kazuaki, Dr.
Fliederweg 29
64342 Seeheim / DE
[1997/27]
Application number, filing date96119495.805.12.1996
[1997/27]
Priority number, dateDE199514912329.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19549123
[1997/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0781770
Date:02.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0781770
Date:05.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:C07D319/06, C09K19/34
[1997/27]
CPC:
C07D319/06 (EP,US); C09K19/3402 (EP,US); C09K2019/3422 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1997/27]
TitleGerman:1,3-Dioxane und flüssigkristallines Medium[1997/27]
English:1,3-Dioxanes and liquid crystalline medium[1997/27]
French:1,3-Dioxanes et milieu de cristaux liquides[1997/27]
Examination procedure04.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
07.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2002Fee for grant paid
20.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8603769  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * Seite 9, Formeln Ig und Ih; Ansprüche 1-3 *;
 [X]WO8802018  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * Seite 9. Formeln Ig und Ih; Ansprüche 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP0464648  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * Seite 3, Formel Id; Ansprüche 1-9 *;
 [Y]EP0154840  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * example 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]WO9406885  (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * Seite 4, Formel 15; Seite 56, Beispiele 108, 109; Ansprüche 1-25 *
by applicantEP0387032
 EP0447565
 US5322638
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.