EP0776779 - Hybrid drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hata, Hiroshi 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | 02 /
Kubo, Seitoku 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | 03 /
Taga, Yutaka 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | 04 /
Ibaraki, Ryuji 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119560.9 | 05.12.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950344937 | 06.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34493795 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0776779 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0776779 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776779 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/02 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
H02K5/203 (US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K7/1815 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0043 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H3/089 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
Y10S903/905 (EP,US);
Y10S903/906 (EP,US);
Y10S903/909 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP,US);
Y10S903/914 (EP,US);
Y10S903/919 (EP,US);
Y10S903/946 (EP,US);
Y10S903/951 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/23] | Title | German: | Hybrides Antriebssystem | [1997/23] | English: | Hybrid drive system | [1997/23] | French: | Système d'entraînement hybride | [2000/44] |
Former [1997/23] | Système d'entrainement hybride | Examination procedure | 02.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06328951 ; | [XA]DE3140492 (LOESCH LUDWIG) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 5; | [XA]DE3230121 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,10,11 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5,12,14,25; | [A]US4518070 (OOKA YUZO [JP]) [A] 12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4102202 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,17,18,21,22 * column 5, line 34 - line 45 * * column 8, line 26 - line 34 ** figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0528412 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,25 * column 17, line 12 - column 19, line 12 * * figures 12,14,15 * [A] 2-4,10,12,20; | [A]US5415603 (TUZUKI SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,10,12,15-17,25 * column 2, line 5 - line 11 * * figures 1A,1B,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 095, no. 002, & JP06328951 A 19941129 (AQUEOUS RES:KK) [A] 1,2,5,25 * abstract * | Examination | DE4113386 | WO9513201 | by applicant | JPH03121928 |