EP0780356 - Method for preparing a solution of an alkali salt of anthrahydroquinone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI KASEI CHEMICALS LTD. 3-8-2, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states KAWASAKI KASEI CHEMICALS LTD. 3-8-2, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states KAWASAKI KASEI CHEMICALS LTD. 3-8-2, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suganuma Hiroyuki, Kawasaki Kasei Chem. Ltd. 1-2, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119643.3 | 06.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | JP19950333818 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33381895 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0780356 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0780356 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780356 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/06, C07C37/07, C07C39/235 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
C07C37/64 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/64, C07C39/235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lösung eines Alkalisalzes von Anthrahydrochinon | [1997/26] | English: | Method for preparing a solution of an alkali salt of anthrahydroquinone | [1997/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une solution d'un sel alcalin d'anthrahydroquinone | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5692234 ; | ES2030343 [ ] (UNIV MADRID COMPLUTENSE [ES]); | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811021), vol. 005, no. 164, Database accession no. (C - 076), & JP56092234 A 19810725 (KAWASAKI KASEI CHEM LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - J. TIJERO MIQUEL, ET AL., "Reduction of anthraquinone with sodium sulfide in an alkaline medium", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920316), vol. 116, no. 11, Database accession no. 105792b, page 726, XP002034162 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - REV. R. ACAD. CIENC. EXACTAS, FIS. NAT. MADRID, (1990), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 157 - 159 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931129), vol. 119, no. 22, Database accession no. 228358j, page 142, XP002034163 [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | - P.WANDELT: "The effect of 1,4-dihydro-9,10-dihydroxy-anthracene on soda and kraft cooking of pine", Paperi ja Puu - Papper och Trä, 1984, no. 11, pages 673 to 681 | by applicant | - USEFUL WATER AND WASTE WATER., (1989), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 294 - 305 |