EP0779385 - High density fine weave fabric made of microfibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plauener Spinnhütte GmbH Celler Strasse 20 08525 Plauen / DE | [2001/04] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states Plauener Gewebetechnik GmbH & Co. KG Celler Strasse 20 08525 Plauen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thierling, Michael Kirchhofstrasse 41 29225 Celle / DE | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Gosch, Wolf-Dietrich, et al Rechtsanwälte Dr. Armin Herdt, Wolf-Dietrich Gosch, Dr. Manfred Georg Bullinger, H. A. Schlunk, Ballindamm 13 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | [1997/25] | Application number, filing date | 96119802.5 | 10.12.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | DE1995146876 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546876 | [1997/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779385 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779385 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D1/00, D03D15/00, D03D13/00 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
D03D13/004 (EP);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D03D13/008 (EP);
D03D15/33 (EP);
D03D15/49 (EP);
D10B2331/04 (EP);
D10B2401/063 (EP);
D10B2501/00 (EP);
D10B2503/06 (EP);
D10B2505/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL [1997/25] | Title | German: | Dichtes Feingewebe aus Mikrofasern | [1997/25] | English: | High density fine weave fabric made of microfibers | [1997/25] | French: | Tissu fin à haute densité à base de microfibres | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59211683 ; | [Y]JPH04119175 ; | [YA]JPH0380037 ; | [A]JPH07246135 ; | [YA]EP0391111 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 17 * column 2, line 19 - line 21 * [A] 1,2; | [YA]EP0424637 (SPINNHUETTE GMBH & CO KG SEIDE [DE]) [Y] 21 * the whole document * [A] 1-5; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 03, Database accession no. 85-015450, XP002028239 & JPS59211683 A 19841130 (TEIJIN KK) [Y] 1-5,14,15,17,21 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920810), vol. 016, no. 369, Database accession no. (C - 0972), & JP04119175 A 19920420 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910625), vol. 015, no. 248, Database accession no. (C - 0843), & JP03080037 A 19910404 (DAINIPPON JOCHUGIKU CO LTD) [Y] 14,15 * abstract * [A] 1,2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 009, & JP07246135 A 19950926 (KURABO IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |