EP0793376 - Method of transferring and displaying 3-D shape data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultra-high Speed Network and Computer Technology Laboratories 2-6, Toranomon 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states Ultra-high Speed Network and Computer Technology Laboratories 2-6, Toranomon 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagasawa, Mikio, c/o Ultra-high Speed Network Com.Techn.Lab., 2-6 Toranomon 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nishioka, Daisuke, c/o Ultra-high speed Network Comp.Tech.Lab., 2-6 Toranomon 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119986.6 | 12.12.1996 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19960042545 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4254596 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793376 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793376 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/41, H04N1/21, H04N7/26 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G06T15/10 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | H04N1/41 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung und Anzeige von 3D-Form-Daten | [1997/36] | English: | Method of transferring and displaying 3-D shape data | [1997/36] | French: | Méthode de transmission et d'affichage de données 3D | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/36] | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0152355 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * page 11 - page 15, column 2 *; | [A]EP0581256 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 22 - page 10, line 21 * | [X] - FORCHHEIMER R ET AL, "IMAGE CODING-FROM WAVEFORMS TO ANIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19891201), vol. 37, no. 12, pages 2008 - 2023, XP000099504 [X] 1,5 * page 2011, column 1, line 19 - page 2013 * * page 2016, column 2, line 15 - page 2021, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/29.45550 | [X] - ECK M ET AL, "MULTIRESOLUTION ANALYSIS OF ARBITRARY MESHES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS, LOS ANGELES, AUG. 6 - 11, 1995, COOK R, (19950806), pages 173 - 182, XP000546226 [X] 1,5 * page 173 - page 174, column 1, line 35 * | [Y] - KOIKE A ET AL, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL MOTION ESTIMATION OF HEAD IN MODEL-BASED CODING OF MOVING FACIAL IMAGES", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, (19920801), vol. 75, PART 1, no. 8, pages 64 - 75, XP000324993 [Y] 1-5 * page 64 - page 67, column 1 * |