EP0783124 - Improvements in or relating to spatial light modulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knipe, Richard L. 4101 County Rd. 1006 McKinney, TX 75070 / US | 02 /
Strumpell, Mark H. 1328 Finley Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 03 /
Mignardi, Michael A. 7827 Alto Caro Drive Dallas, TX 75248 / US | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/28] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120171.2 | 13.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | US19950008674 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: US 8674 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783124 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783124 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
G02B26/0825 (EP,US);
G02F1/015 (KR);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/28] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für räumliche Lichtmodulatoren | [1997/28] | English: | Improvements in or relating to spatial light modulators | [1997/28] | French: | Améliorations concernant les modulateurs de lumière spatiaux | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2002 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5285196 (GALE JR RICHARD O [US]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, line 35 - line 68 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 30 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 26; figures 1,2,4,7 *; | [A]US5331454 (HORNBECK LARRY J [US]) [A] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 30 - line 43 ** column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5447600 (WEBB DOUGLAS A [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 26 - line 66; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4596992 | US5061049 | US5535047 |