EP0784934 - Apparatus and method for making a multi-flavored frozen confection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states White, Neal Edwin 64 Ogle Road Old Tappan, NJ 07675 / US | For all designated states Margolis, Kenneth D. 10 Cedar Hollow Drive Rose Valley, PA 19086 / US | [1997/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120176.1 | 16.12.1996 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | US19950574115 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: US 574115 | US19950574116 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: US 574116 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0784934 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0784934 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784934 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/26, A23G9/14, A23G9/02, A23G9/28, A23G9/22 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
A23G9/282 (EP);
A23G9/14 (EP);
A23G9/221 (EP);
A23G9/26 (EP);
A23G9/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | A23G9/26, A23G9/14, A23G9/02, A23G9/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitung von gefrorenem Mehraromenkonfekt | [2003/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for making a multi-flavored frozen confection | [1997/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de confiserie congelée à plusieurs parfums | [1997/30] |
Former [1997/30] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitung von gefrorenen Mehraromenkonfekt | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2003 | FI | 09.07.2003 | PT | 09.12.2003 | IE | 16.12.2003 | [2005/03] |
Former [2004/14] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 09.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6098947 ; | [A]DE252099 (L. BRAQUIER) [A] 4,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US1472229 (PLEMPEL CHARLES A); | [A]DE537058 (HEINRICH SCHEER) [A] 3,22 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1949772 (ALLEN PHILIP S) [Y] 69-72,75-79 * the whole document *; | [A]US2670696 (COVERT CLAUDE J, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [X]US2747525 (LUND CLINTON O) [X] 39-41 * the whole document *; | [A]US2975732 (DE PASQUALE PATRICK J) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB1145854 (NESTLE SA) [A] 3,22 * figures 6-10,12 *; | [Y]DE1757951 (WESTIN SVEN) [Y] 69-72,75-79 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2243542 (OBERMAIER); | [A]GB2005125 (GRAM BRDR AS) [A] 6,7,36,37 * column 2, line 31 - line 38 *; | [A]US4369200 (IWAO HACHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 69-72 * column W *; | [A]US4426402 (KAUPERT GUEENTHER [DE]) [A] 4,23 * column W *; | [A]GB2135437 (GRAM BRDR AS); | [XY]US4986080 (GRIGOLI FRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 39,43,56,63,68 * the whole document * [Y] 45,46,49,54,55,57,61,62; | [A]EP0558247 (CCA INC [JP]) [A] 51,58,60,65,67 * column 1, line 1 - column 14 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 8 * * column 7, line 1 - line 16 * * column 10, line 14 - line 40; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0589820 (AASTED MIKROVERK APS [DK]) [A] 3,22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9412046 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 4,23,56,63 * the whole document *; | [A]US5343710 (CATHENAUT PHILIP I [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,22 * column W *; | [XY]US5374436 (WHITE NEAL E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-12,14-22,24-27,29-35,42,45,46,55,62 * column W * [Y] 4,23,56,63; | [X]EP0642899 (CCA INC [JP]) [X] 51-53,58,60,64,65,67 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 26, line 19 - line 34 * * column 28, line 31 - line 56 * * column 30, line 31 - line 46 * * column 31, line 4; figure - * * column 23, line 32 - line 44 *; | [A]US5426836 (LYNCH WILLIAM R [US]); | [Y]WO9532633 (AASTED MIKROVERK APS [DK], et al) [Y] 45,46,49,54,55,57,61,62 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5582856 (WHITE NEAL E [US], et al) [PX] 1-79 * column W * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850927), vol. 009, no. 241, Database accession no. (C - 306), & JP60098947 A 19850601 (FUJI NIYUUGIYOU KK) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,15,20,21,24,30 * abstract * | by applicant | US1429405 | US2674960 | US2747525 | US3971853 | US4188768 | US4986080 | US5343710 | US5374436 |