EP0796553 - Sowing implement, in particular for mulch seeding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rabe Agrarsysteme GmbH & Co. KG Am Rabewerk 1 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2002/33] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states Rabewerk GmbH + Co. 49152 Bad Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerdom, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Westenseite 21 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/33] | Böck, Bernhard Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Böck Tappe Kollegen Bismarckstrasse 43 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120221.5 | 17.12.1996 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | DE19962005356U | 22.03.1996 Original published format: DE 29605356 U | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796553 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0796553 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796553 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06, A01B49/06, A01C7/20 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
A01B49/06 (EP);
A01C7/203 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | A01C5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1997/39] | Title | German: | Sägerät, insbesondere für Mulchsaat | [1997/39] | English: | Sowing implement, in particular for mulch seeding | [1997/39] | French: | Semoir, en particulier pour semis en paillage | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.12.2003
02.04.2004
WITHDRAWN Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.12.2003
02.04.2004
WITHDRAWN Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.12.2003
WITHDRAWN Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | 17.03.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.09.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 14.01.2005 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]WO8505246 (VAEDERSTAD VERKEN AB [SE]) [DX] 1,2,6,17 * page 3, line 26 - page 14, line 16 * * figure - * [Y] 10,11,13,15,22-26; | [Y]DE9213091U (RABEWERK GMBH) [Y] 10,11,13,15,24,25 * page 7, line 9 - page 12, line 32 * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0501836 (UNIV MASSEY [NZ]) [Y] 22 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [YA]GB2011236 (ICI LTD) [Y] 23 * page 2, line 37 - line 115 * * figures 4-6 * [A] 1; | [YA]FR65716E (MIGUET, PAUL; PERRON, MARCEL) [Y] 26 * page 2 * * figure - * [A] 1; | [A]GB2222756 (MOORE SAMUEL) [A] 1,14 * page 4 - page 6 * * figure - *; | [A]US5398771 (HORNUNG DONALD F [US], et al) [A] 20 * column 7, line 19 - column 9, line 11 * * figures 4,5,8 *; | [A]US4116140 (ANDERSON JOSEPH A, et al) [A] 21 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO8505246 | DE3541542 |