Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29719345U | 15.01.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | DE29719345 | 31.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3057316B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2000 | B2 | JPH10155814 | 16.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0839500 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2001 | B1 | EP0839500 | 06.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE199308T | 15.03.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19644015 | 02.01.1998 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0839500T | 18.06.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5769853 | 23.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19644015 | 31.10.1996 |