EP0839500 - Bone rasp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quétin, Roswitha Jakob-Schober-Strasse 5 69181 Leimen / DE | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120473.2 | 19.12.1996 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | DE1996144015 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644015 | [1998/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839500 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839500 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16, A61F2/28 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/4644 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, PT, SE [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Knochenraspel | [1998/19] | English: | Bone rasp | [1998/19] | French: | Râpe à os | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2001 | PT | 28.05.2001 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3734714 (LEIBINGER OSWALD GMBH) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US5147407 (TAEGER KARL H [DE]); | [A]FR2712483 (SETIEY LOUIS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |