EP0780565 - EGR system using a control valve arranged perpendicularly to the axis of an air intake passage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honda, Akihiro c/o Denso Corporation, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref, 448 / JP | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/26] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120512.7 | 19.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | JP19950333658 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33365895 | JP19960223922 | 26.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22392296 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0780565 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0780565 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780565 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F02M35/10 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
F02D9/1065 (EP,US);
F02M26/21 (EP,US);
F02M26/55 (EP,US);
F02M26/67 (EP,US);
F02M35/10222 (EP,US);
F02M35/10255 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/26] | Title | German: | Abgasrückführungssystem mit senkrecht zum Lufteinlasskanal angeordnetem Steuerventil | [1997/26] | English: | EGR system using a control valve arranged perpendicularly to the axis of an air intake passage | [1997/26] | French: | Système de recirculation de gaz d'échappement avec valve de commande disposée perpendiculairement par rapport à l'axe d'un conduit d'admission d'air | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE4338192 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 37 - line 45; figure 1 * [A] 3-5 [Y] 11; | [YDA]EP0349729 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [YD] 11 * figure 1 * [A] 6,18; | [X]US4005692 (NOHIRA HIDETAKA, et al) [X] 1,7,12,13 * column 2, line 36 - line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPS5344725 ; | [X]EP0363021 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [X]US3500807 (DAIGH HAROLD D) [X] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]US4048967 (STUMPP GERHARD) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,7,12-14; | [X]DE2232705 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 5 *; | [X]FR2174502 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE2315432 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US1544937 (QUICK WILLIAM M) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 21; figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 69 - line 80 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780621), vol. 002, no. 078, Database accession no. (M - 024), & JP53044725 A 19780421 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,7,8,12,13 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0349729 | JPH0466347U |