EP0782013 - Magnetic marker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Shuji 13-403 Kangetsukyo-danchi, 176-1, Taichoro Momoyama-cho, Fushimi-ku / JP | 02 /
Hirano, Toshiyuki 37-23, Shinmeimiyanishi Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Amiya, Kenji 55-655, Ujikageyama Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120897.2 | 27.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | JP19950340290 | 27.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34029095 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0782013 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0782013 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01V15/00 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
G01V15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1997/27] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Markierungselement | [1997/27] | English: | Magnetic marker | [1997/27] | French: | Marqueur magnétique | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/36] | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH04195384 ; | [A]EP0643376 (KNOGO CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * page 5, line 24 - line 34 *; | [A]EP0604293 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US5017907 (CORDERY ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * figures 2,4 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921028), vol. 016, no. 525, Database accession no. (P - 1446), & JP04195384 A 19920715 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 1,5-9 * abstract * [A] 2-4,10-21 | [A] - MOHRI K ET AL, "LARGE BARKHAUSEN AND MATTEUCCI EFFECTS IN FECOSIB, FECRSIB, AND FENISIB AMORPHOUS WIRES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (19900901), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 1789 - 1791, XP000150295 [A] 2,12 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.104526 |