EP0726598 - Moulding apparatus with compensation element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FICO B.V. Ratio 6 6921 RW Duiven / NL | [1999/17] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states Fico B.V. Edisonstraat 90 NL-6942 PZ Didam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, Gerardus F.W. Loodijk 3 NL-6924 SC Loo / NL | 02 /
Peters, Hendrikus J.B. Haaghweg 12 NL-6942 GP Didam / NL | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 NL-5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [1999/17] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [1999/02] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. P.O. Box 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [1998/39] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. Maliebaan 46 3581 CS Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [1996/33] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200045.1 | 10.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | NL19950000238 | 09.02.1995 Original published format: NL 9500238 | [1996/33] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726598 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726598 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
B29C45/14418 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C45/14655 (EP,US);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14098 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S425/044 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/33] | Title | German: | Giessvorrichtung mit Kompensationselement | [1996/33] | English: | Moulding apparatus with compensation element | [1996/33] | French: | Appareil de moulage à élément de compensation | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.04.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05218508 ; | [A]JPH04179130 ; | [X]JPH0671685 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931207), vol. 017, no. 661, Database accession no. (E - 1471), & JP05218508 A 19930827 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921009), vol. 016, no. 488, Database accession no. (E - 1277), & JP04179130 A 19920625 (HITACHI TOKYO ELECTRON CO LTD) [A] 10,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940616), vol. 018, no. 317, Database accession no. (M - 1622), & JP06071685 A 19940315 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * |