Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0773367
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.03.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] |
03.04.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |
27.01.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.1997 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.10.1997 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
17.09.1997 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
25.07.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
27.03.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] |