Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09170589 | Global Dossier | 30.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0773367 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1998 | B1 | EP0773367 | 14.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69600306T | 10.09.1998 | T2 | DE69600306D1 | 25.06.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE773367T | 11.09.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1281025 | 11.02.1998 | B1 | ITTO950911 | 10.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5688106 | 18.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | ITTO950911 | 10.11.1995 |