EP0718268 - Process for the production of crystalline adduct of bisphenol A and phenol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiyoda Corporation 12-1, Tsurumichuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states CHIYODA CORPORATION 12-1, Tsurumichuo 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriya, Nobuo 24-23, Okamura 7-chome, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimoda, Keiji 636-6, Kanamori Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Asaoka, Sachio 23-1, Kohnandai 1-chome, Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kameda, Takao Green Heights 1-102, 11-7 Higashihongo 6-chome Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Sakashita, Kouji 1-36-716, Seishincho 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Maejima, Tetsuo 16-10, Takeoka 1-chome Kiyose-shi, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Yasui, Makoto 18-1-206, Shitanoyacho 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Nishijima, Hiroaki 1-201, Kokubukita 1-2 Ebina-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 09 /
Onda, Nobuhiro 8-32, Sennincho 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Kouzaki, Takeshi 167-1, Kawanishicho-kita, Marugame-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/38] |
Former [1996/26] | 01 /
Moriya, Nobuo 24-23, Okamura 7-chome, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Shimoda, Keiji 636-6, Kanamori Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Asaoka, Sachio 23-1, Kohnandai 1-chome, Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kameda, Takao Green Heights 1-102, 11-7 Higashihongo 6-chome Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Sakashita, Kouji 1-36-716, Seishincho 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Maejima, Tetsuo 16-10, Takeoka 1-chome Kiyose-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
07 /
Yasui, Makoto 18-1-206, Shitanoyacho 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Nishijima, Hiroaki 21-101, Kokubukita 1-chome Ebina-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
09 /
Onda, Nobuhiro 8-32, Sennincho 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
10 /
Kouzaki, Takeshi 63-2, Higashikawashimacho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Allam, Peter Clerk LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 96200436.2 | 29.05.1992 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910169557 | 10.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16955791 | JP19910292211 | 11.10.1991 Original published format: JP 29221191 | JP19910306520 | 25.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30652091 | JP19910306521 | 25.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30652191 | JP19910306524 | 25.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30652491 | JP19910311989 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: JP 31198991 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0718268 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0718268 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718268 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/16, C07C37/84 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
B01D3/141 (EP,US);
C07C37/685 (EP,US);
C07C37/84 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/685, C07C39/16 (US,EP);
C07C37/84, C07C39/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kristallinadduktes von Bisphenol A mit Phenol | [1996/26] | English: | Process for the production of crystalline adduct of bisphenol A and phenol | [1996/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un adduit cristallin du bisphénol A avec le phénol | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92304932.4 / EP0522700 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2289476 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]EP0330146 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0332878 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |