EP0729737 - Walking carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premis Medical B.V. Traay 153A 3971 GE Driebergen / NL | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keuning, Ronald Sperwerkamp 31 3972 WB Driebergen / NL | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/36] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200562.5 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | NL19950000423 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: NL 9500423 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729737 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729737 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/04 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
A61H3/04 (EP,US);
A61H2003/002 (EP,US);
A61H2003/004 (EP,US);
A61H2003/046 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0161 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Gehwagen | [1996/36] | English: | Walking carriage | [1996/36] | French: | Appui mobile pour la déambulation | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 21.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Richard van Seenus Nederland B.V. Bolderweg 6 1332 AT Almere / NL Opponent's representative Aalbers, Arnt Reinier De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Richard van Seenus Nederland B.V. Bolderweg 6 1332 AT Almere / NL Opponent's representative Aalbers, Arnt Reinier De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | 15.07.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/28] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2003 | GB | 01.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | DK | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | DE | 01.10.2003 | NL | 01.10.2003 | FR | 27.11.2003 | [2004/31] |
Former [2004/29] | AT | 01.03.2003 | |
GB | 01.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 01.03.2003 | |
GB | 01.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 01.03.2003 | |
GB | 01.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 01.03.2003 | |
GB | 01.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 01.03.2003 | |
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 01.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3778866 (NAKANISHI Y) [X] 10 * column 1, line 61 - line 62 *; | [A]EP0007708 (BARKER ALFRED WALTER) [A] 4* page 10, line 18 - line 25; figures 8,9 *; | [A]DE9005744U (DÖSCHER) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1; figure - * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5261682 (CHUANG CHING-PAO [TW]) [A] 1,5 * column A; figures 1,4-7 * * column 2, line 39 - line 60 *; | [A]DE4328875 (HORACEK GREGOR [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 3 - line 34; figure - * |