EP0731165 - Human T-cell line infected with HIV-2 which secretes functionally intact HIV-2 GP160 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states bioMérieux, Inc. 100 Rodolphe Street Durham, NC 27712 / US | [2005/27] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states bioMérieux, Inc. 100 Akzo Avenue Treyburn Durham, NC 27712 / US | ||
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarngadharan, Mangalasseril Gopalan 8422 Holly Leaf Drive McLean, VA 22101 / US | 02 /
Kalyanaraman, Vaniambadi Srinivasan 20821 Spinning Wheel Place Germantown, MD 20874 / US | 03 /
Larue Kalisz, Irene 3553 Hopeland Rd. Frederick, MD 21704 / US | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/01] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/37] | Van Gent, Marieke N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200578.1 | 04.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | US19950402481 | 07.03.1995 Original published format: US 402481 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0731165 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0731165 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731165 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0731165 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C07K14/155, G01N33/569 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
G01N33/56988 (KR);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2740/16034 (KR);
C12N2740/16051 (KR);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US);
G01N2333/162 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | Mit HIV-2 infizierte menschliche T-Zelllinie die funktionell intaktes HIV-2 gp160 sekretiert | [2004/42] | English: | Human T-cell line infected with HIV-2 which secretes functionally intact HIV-2 GP160 | [1996/37] | French: | Lignée de lymphocytes-T humaine, infectée par le HIV-2 sécrétant une HIV-2 gp160 fonctionellement intacte | [1996/37] |
Former [1996/37] | Mit HIV-2 infizierte menschliche T-Zelllinie der fonktionell intakte HIV-2 gp160 sekretiert | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | IE | 06.03.2006 | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8906276 (DEUTSCHES PRIMATENZENTRUM GMBH [DE]); | [XD]US5116740 (SARNGADHARAN MANGALASSERIL G [US], et al); | [XD]US5122468 (SARNGADHARAN MANGALASSERIL G [US], et al) |