Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0731126
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
14.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
30.07.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] |
05.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.1998 |
First examination report |
|
08.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.01.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
01.08.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] |
02.08.1996 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
26.07.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] |