EP0734646 - Method for moving a member towards a fixed stop in a forage harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2002/02] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Léon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paquet, Bert J.F. Sint-Baafsstraat, 19 8200 Sint-Andries / BE | 02 /
Ameye, Dirk C.A. Wilgenlaan, 22 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 96200796.9 | 22.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | GB19950006717 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9506717 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734646 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734646 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01F29/20 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
A01F29/095 (EP,US);
Y10S56/02 (EP);
Y10S56/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bewegung eines Teils zu einem festen Halt in einem Feldhäcksler | [2001/06] | English: | Method for moving a member towards a fixed stop in a forage harvester | [1996/40] | French: | Procédé pour mouvoir un membre vers un stop fixe dans un récolteuse-hacheuse | [1996/40] |
Former [1996/40] | Verfahren zur Bewegung eines Zeil zu einen festen Halt in einem Feldhäcksler | Examination procedure | 26.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 27.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.01.2002 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0291216 (FORD NEW HOLLAND INC [US]) [DA] 1,4,9,11 * column W *; | [A]EP0335256 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]WO8201299 (TORO CO [US]); | [A]FR2537832 (HESSTON CORP [US]); | [DA]EP0287159 (FORD NEW HOLLAND INC [US]); | [A]US5083976 (MCCLURE JOHN R [US], et al) |