EP0736932 - Connector, housing thereof and metal hood thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/41] | Connector | ||
[1998/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Droesbeke, Gert Dijleweg 108 2820 Borheiden / BE | 02 /
Creele, Eddy Kamiel Denderbellestraat 166 9200 Dendermonde / BE | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2009/40] |
Former [1996/41] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke De Vries & Metman, Gebouw Autumn, Overschiestraat 184 N 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200807.4 | 26.03.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | NL19951000052 | 05.04.1995 Original published format: NL 1000052 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736932 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736932 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/516, H01R13/627, H01R13/514 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/514 (EP);
H01R13/516 (EP);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R13/6215 (EP);
H01R13/6593 (EP);
H01R13/6595 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | Verbinder, Gehäuse davon und metallische Haube davon | [1998/36] | English: | Connector, housing thereof and metal hood thereof | [1998/36] | French: | Connecteur, son boîtier et son enveloppe métallique | [1998/36] |
Former [1996/41] | Verbinder | ||
Former [1996/41] | Connector | ||
Former [1996/41] | Connecteur | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9222943 (GORE & ASS) [A] 1-5 * column 6, paragraph 2 - page 11; figures 1-16 *; | [A]DE9311781U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]AU446128B (BRYANT MANUFACTURING PTY. LIMITED) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 8; figures 1-4 * |