Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0736804
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
20.05.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
28.05.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
22.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.11.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.12.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.08.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.09.1997 |
First examination report |
|
04.07.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] |
06.12.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
23.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |