EP0736804 - Photographic conditioning solution containing polyaminocarboxylic acid as sole antimicrobial agent and method of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGuckin, Hugh Gerald, c/o Kodak Eastman Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Badger, John Stuart, c/o Kodak Eastman Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Craver, Mary Ellen, c/o Kodak Eastman Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1996/41] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96200889.2 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | US19950417290 | 05.04.1995 Original published format: US 417290 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736804 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736804 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736804 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C7/42 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
G03C7/3046 (EP,US);
G03C1/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/41] | Title | German: | Photographische Konditionierungslösung, die Polyamincarbonsäure als einziges antimikrobielles Mittel enthalt, und diese verwendendes Verfahren | [1996/41] | English: | Photographic conditioning solution containing polyaminocarboxylic acid as sole antimicrobial agent and method of use | [1996/41] | French: | Solution de conditionnement, photographique contenant un acide polyaminocarboxylique comme seul agent microbien et méthode d'utilisation | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4921779 (CULLINAN ANN M [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * column 5, line 45 - line 55; examples 1-3 *; | [Y]US5034308 (ABE AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 10; claims 1-4 * * column 2, line 52 - line 68 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 44 *; | [A]EP0577041 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 7* page 2, line 35 - line 42; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0591934 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 4 - line 18 * * page 18, line 3 - line 4; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]US5348845 (MORIGAKI MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 15, line 50 - line 60; claim 13 * * column 95, line 47 - line 54 * * column 96, line 45 - line 68 * |