EP0800772 - Process and apparatus for manufacturing extruded ice confection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daouse, Alain 224 Rue du Larris 60430 Noailles / FR | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Archambault, Jean, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [1997/42] | Application number, filing date | 96200987.4 | 12.04.1996 | [1997/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800772 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800772 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/28, A23G9/02 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
A23G9/44 (EP,US);
A23G9/285 (EP,US);
A23G9/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von extrudierter Speiseeis | [1997/42] | English: | Process and apparatus for manufacturing extruded ice confection | [1997/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de confiserie glacée extrudée | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 12.04.2002 | LU | 12.04.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/29] | IE | 12.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1560842 (NETTLESHIP WILLIAM L) [A] 6 * page 1, line 73 - line 81; figure 6 *; | [A]GB505472 (NEWLY WEDS BAKING COMPANY, et al); | [A]BE624881 (ESKIMO PIE CORP. [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1420328 (NAT DAIRY PROD CORP); | [DA]US3227103 (LEONHARD SCHAFER); | [A]GB1076117 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]GB1169500 (NAT DAIRY PROD CORP [US]) [A] * page 5, line 92 - page 6, line 115; figure - *; | [A]US3840311 (WIGHT E) [A] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 34; figures 3,4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0044689 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [A]FR2497728 (JAEGER GERARD [FR]); | [A]US4507326 (TARANTINO JEFFREY W [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * figures 3-5; claim - *; | [DA]EP0293022 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) |