EP0805205 - Nitrate reduction system of Staphylococcus carnosus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fast, Beate Heuberger Torweg 15/91 72076 Tuebingen / DE | 02 /
Gaier, Walter Ch. de l'Haut Bozon 2 1801 Le Mont Pelerin / CH | 03 /
Götz, Friedrich Beim Herbstenhof 31 72076 Tuebingen / DE | 04 /
Lindgren, Per-Eric Vretgränd 14 75322 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
Neubauer, Heike Moltkestr. 31 72072 Tuebingen / DE | 06 /
Pantel, Iris Kieferweg 9 72810 Gomaringen / DE | [1997/45] | Application number, filing date | 96201224.1 | 02.05.1996 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805205 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N15/74, C02F3/34, A23L1/015, A23L2/84 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A23L2/84 (EP);
A23L5/25 (EP);
A23L5/28 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N15/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Nitratreduktionssystem aus Staphylococcus carnosus | [1997/45] | English: | Nitrate reduction system of Staphylococcus carnosus | [1997/45] | French: | Système de réduction du nitrate à partir de Staphylococcus carnosus | [1997/45] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04207160 ; | [A]WO8900547 (BAENSCH TETRA WERKE) [A] 11-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0244663 (EDEN GMBH) [A] 11-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0515721 (ECKES FA PETER) [A] 11-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - NEUBAUER, HEIKE ET AL, "Physiology and interaction of nitrate and nitrite reduction in Staphylococcus carnosus", J. BACTERIOL. (1996), 178(7), 2005-9, XP000611260 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - REISS, J., "Reduction of nitrate in carrot juice by immobilized cells of Staphylococcus carnosus", DTSCH. LEBENSM.-RUNDSCH. (1992), 88(11), 352-3, XP000609667 [A] 11-18 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 37, Database accession no. 92-302645, XP002018855 & JPH04207160 A 19920729 (NORINSHO KK) [A] 11-18 * abstract * | [A] - ANDERSSON R, "NITRATE REDUCTION DURING FERMENTATION BY GRAM-NEGATIVE BACTERIAL ACTIVITY IN CARROTS.", INT J FOOD MICROBIOL 2 (4). 1985. 219-226, XP000611263 [A] 11-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1605(85)90012-1 |