EP0740453 - Imaging device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMON MARKETING, INC. 1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 550 Los Angeles California 90067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states SIMON MARKETING, INC. 1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 550 Los Angeles, California 90067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filo, Andrew S. 22670 Oakcrest Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96201866.9 | 08.10.1991 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | US19900598266 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: US 598266 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740453 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740453 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/028 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
B41M5/48 (EP,US);
G03G15/04 (KR);
B41M5/26 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G07C15/005 (EP,US);
H04N1/00795 (EP,US);
H04N1/00803 (EP,US);
H04N1/00806 (EP,US);
H04N1/02865 (EP,US);
H04N1/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/128 (EP,US);
H04N1/2323 (EP,US);
Y10S283/903 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/44] | Title | German: | Abbildungsgerät und -verfahren | [1996/44] | English: | Imaging device and method | [1996/44] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de lecture d'images | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/44] | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91309194.8 / EP0481648 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0045252 (MATRA [FR]) [X] 1-4,8 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 28 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]JPS62233974 ; | [Y]EP0282182 (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 27 - line 53 *; | [A]DE4011281 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 7 * column 4, line 34 - line 53 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 012, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 596), & JP62233974 A 19871014 (KOMATSU LTD) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * |