EP0756259 - RDS-TMC radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1997/05] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rühl, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwalt. GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/15] |
Former [2001/32] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96202039.2 | 18.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | DE1995127187 | 26.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19527187 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756259 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756259 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
H04H20/55 (EP,US);
H04B1/06 (KR);
G08G1/094 (EP,US);
H04H20/34 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/05] | Title | German: | RDS-TMC-Rundfunkempfänger | [1997/05] | English: | RDS-TMC radio receiver | [1997/05] | French: | Récepteur radio RDS-TMC | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3536820 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 9, line 11 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0263253 (RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 47 *; | [A]DE4112828 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 16; figure 2 *; | [E]EP0725501 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [E] 1-9* the whole document * |